TX SB248 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; requiring occupational permits; imposing fees; providing civil and administrative penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; requiring occupational permits; imposing fees; providing civil and administrative penalties; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1760 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1521 (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1760 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1521 (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1760 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1521 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Thierry |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADVERTISING
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PERMITS
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
Tobacco Products
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PERMITS
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
Tobacco Products