TX SB2440 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Summary
Relating to the Bexar Metropolitan Water District.
Title
Relating to the Bexar Metropolitan Water District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Amended | |
2009-05-05 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BEXAR METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT
Elections
Elections--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Elections
Elections--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility