TX SB239 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of educational materials regarding disease prevention during a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of educational materials regarding disease prevention during a disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1499 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1499
2021-05-26HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HouseObjections withdrawn
2021-05-26HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-20HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-14SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-10SenateFiled
2020-12-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB239
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00239I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00239S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00239E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00239H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00239F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00239I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00239I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00239S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00239S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00239E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00239H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00239F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB239&RcdVtNo=1499&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB239&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback