TX SB2376 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of Support Adoption specialty license plates and to the Support Adoption account and certain voluntary contributions to that account.
Title
Relating to the issuance of Support Adoption specialty license plates and to the Support Adoption account and certain voluntary contributions to that account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2052 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2052 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2052 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADOPTION
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment