TX SB2355 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conflicts of interest and discrimination policies for an ethics or medical committee review of an advance directive.
Title
Relating to conflicts of interest and discrimination policies for an ethics or medical committee review of an advance directive.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3743 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2355 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02355I.htm |