TX SB2355 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the creation of the pipeline safety fund.
Title
Relating to the creation of the pipeline safety fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3658 (Same As) 2009-04-29 - Left pending in committee