TX SB233 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Rowlett Pecan Grove Management District; providing authority to impose a tax, levy an assessment, and issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Rowlett Pecan Grove Management District; providing authority to impose a tax, levy an assessment, and issue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Read | |
2011-05-23 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-16 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-19 | Filed | |
2010-11-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ROWLETT PECAN GROVE MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous