TX SB2312 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4626 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee