TX SB23 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to enforcement of the rights of a living child born after an abortion; creating a civil cause of action; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to enforcement of the rights of a living child born after an abortion; creating a civil cause of action; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Point of order sustained (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Point of order sustained |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Point of order |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Johnson |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 RodrĂguez |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19