TX SB2271 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of Port Neches Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of Port Neches Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenatePassed
2017-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2017-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-12SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-04-12SenateRead first time
2017-04-11SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-04-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback