TX SB2256 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Summary
Relating to the establishment and operation of the Texas Women Veterans Program.
Title
Relating to the establishment and operation of the Texas Women Veterans Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Amended | |
2009-05-04 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4362 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs