TX SB2250 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the Karnes County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the Karnes County Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2708 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
KARNES COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital