TX SB224 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the award of a distinction designation to a public school campus.
Title
Relating to the award of a distinction designation to a public school campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-10 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Education | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-18 | Filed | |
2010-11-18 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety