TX SB2205 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to automated motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to automated motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1466 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback