TX SB2202 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the social studies curriculum in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the social studies curriculum in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-12SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenatePermission to introduce
2021-04-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3979 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB4093 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Education
HB3979 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2202
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02202I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02202S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02202E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02202I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02202I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02202S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02202S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=32
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=32

Bill Comments

feedback