TX HB4093 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civics instruction public school students and instruction policies in public schools.
Title
Relating to civics instruction public school students and instruction policies in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3979 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB3979 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2202 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Referred to Public Education
HB3979 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2202 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4093 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04093I.htm |