TX SB22 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-24 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-24 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Title
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-06-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-06-22 | Record vote | |
2011-06-22 | Passed | |
2011-06-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-22 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-22 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-06-22 | Record vote | |
2011-06-22 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-06-22 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-06-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-06-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-06-14 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-06-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-06-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-03 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | |
2011-06-03 | Read first time | |
2011-06-01 | Filed | |
2011-06-01 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |