TX SB2194 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use certain tax revenue for hotel and convention center projects and other qualified projects.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to use certain tax revenue for hotel and convention center projects and other qualified projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4042 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
GULF OF MEXICO
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
GULF OF MEXICO
HOTELS & MOTELS
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy