TX SB2190 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public retirement systems of certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the public retirement systems of certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1803 (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1101 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1034 (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - RV#1033 (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1032 (Y: 45 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1101 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1034 (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - RV#1033 (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1032 (Y: 45 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-23 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-17 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-16 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-16 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Motion to table fails |
2017-05-08 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
HOUSTON, CITY OF
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
HOUSTON, CITY OF
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD