TX SB2170 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
MEDICAID
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
MEDICAID
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital