TX SB2166 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenues in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenues in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback