TX SB2146 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-25 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-25 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the annual allocation of certain constitutional funds to eligible agencies and institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the annual allocation of certain constitutional funds to eligible agencies and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-25 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4535 (Same As) 2009-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control