TX SB211 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures for protests and appeals of certain ad valorem tax determinations.
Title
Relating to the procedures for protests and appeals of certain ad valorem tax determinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB994 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--District
Courts--Justice
Courts--Small Claims
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Courts
Courts--District
Courts--Justice
Courts--Small Claims
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB211 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00211I.htm |