TX SB2083 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to outcome measurement and reporting concerning school district and open-enrollment charter school special education programs and grants to public school entities that perform well on the measurements.
Title
Relating to outcome measurement and reporting concerning school district and open-enrollment charter school special education programs and grants to public school entities that perform well on the measurements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Education | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
INTERNET
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
INTERNET