TX SB2078 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the duties of school districts, open-enrollment charter schools, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas School Safety Center regarding multihazard emergency operations plans and other school safety measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the duties of school districts, open-enrollment charter schools, the Texas Education Agency, and the Texas School Safety Center regarding multihazard emergency operations plans and other school safety measures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1541 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1540 (Y: 51 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-21 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1503 (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - RV#1501 RV#1502 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#1501 (Y: 50 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1500 (Y: 51 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed
2017-05-22HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseAmended
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2017-05-21HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-21HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-28SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02078I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02078S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02078E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02078H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=43
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1501&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1502&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1503&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1540&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2078&RcdVtNo=1541&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017

Bill Comments

feedback