TX SB2056 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
City Government
City Government--Finance
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Finance
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy