TX SB205 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.
Title
Relating to the use of information from the lists of noncitizens and nonresidents excused or disqualified from jury service.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |