TX SB2048 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.
Title
Relating to a privilege from disclosure to governmental units for certain evidence concerning sermons delivered by a religious leader.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-20 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to suspend posting rule fails |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EVIDENCE
Political Subdivisions
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EVIDENCE
Political Subdivisions
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions