TX SB2031 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain individuals for child health plan coverage or medical assistance on placement, detention, or commitment in and release from certain facilities or other settings.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain individuals for child health plan coverage or medical assistance on placement, detention, or commitment in and release from certain facilities or other settings.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CHILD HEALTH PLAN
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice