TX SB2 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of improper entry from a foreign nation.
Title
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of improper entry from a foreign nation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Filed |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |