TX SB2 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of an education enhancement program for students with certain disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of an education enhancement program for students with certain disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-08-02HouseRead first time
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-25SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenatePassed
2017-07-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-25SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateRecord vote
2017-07-20SenateRules suspended
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order overruled
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Education
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-20SenateFiled
2017-07-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB2
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00002I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00002S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00002E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00002H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-20-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=54
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=55
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=56
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-24-F.PDF#page=57
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback