TX SB2 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for a capital felony committed by an individual younger than 18 years of age.
Title
Relating to the punishment for a capital felony committed by an individual younger than 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Stefani Carter [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-11 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 121 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Dutton (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 121 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-07-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Dutton (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-22 | Effective immediately | |
2013-07-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-07-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-07-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-07-12 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-07-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-11 | House | Passed |
2013-07-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-07-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-11 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2013-07-11 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment as amended tabled |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment amended |
2013-07-11 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-07-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-07-11 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-07-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-07-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-07-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-07-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-07-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-07-11 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-07-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-07-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Filed |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |