TX SB2 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain charter schools.
Title
Relating to certain charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-26 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-17 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-17 - House - SB 2Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-16 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-16 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-16 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-10 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHARTER SCHOOL AUTHORIZING AUTHORITY
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed