TX SB1982 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of pool-related electrical maintenance.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of pool-related electrical maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-24 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-24 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1973 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
ELECTRICIANS & ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions