TX SB1979 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability for the additional tax imposed on land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as agricultural land if the use of the land changes as a result of a condemnation.
Title
Relating to liability for the additional tax imposed on land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as agricultural land if the use of the land changes as a result of a condemnation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
CONDEMNATION
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
CONDEMNATION
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions