TX SB1964 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.
Title
Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |