TX SB1943 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictive covenants regarding firearms or firearms ammunition.
Title
Relating to restrictive covenants regarding firearms or firearms ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |