TX SB1933 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain oversight procedures of the state over county elections.
Title
Relating to certain oversight procedures of the state over county elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2219 (Y: 84 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1985 (Y: 81 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1984 (Y: 56 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1961 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1960 (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1959 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1958 (Y: 61 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2219 (Y: 84 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1985 (Y: 81 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1984 (Y: 56 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1961 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1960 (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1959 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-22 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1958 (Y: 61 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2219 |
2023-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1985 |
2023-05-23 | House | Passed |
2023-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1984 |
2023-05-23 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Ramos |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1961 |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended 8-Oliverson and Smith |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1960 |
2023-05-22 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 7-C. Morales |
2023-05-22 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Sections 32(c)(2) and (5) |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1959 |
2023-05-22 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 6-Neave Criado |
2023-05-22 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 3 |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1958 |
2023-05-22 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-Goodwin |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended 4-Manuel |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended 3-Walle |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended 2-Bucy |
2023-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Oliverson, Swanson, Cain, Schofield, Toth, Burrows, Smith, Paul, Klick, Leo-Wilson, DeAyala, More |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5131 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB5131 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB5131 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
ALAN VERA ELECTION ACCOUNTABILITY ACT OF 2023
AUDITS & AUDITORS
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Elections--Voting Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE
AUDITS & AUDITORS
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Elections--Voting Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE