TX SB1917 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a public outreach campaign for aging adults with visual impairments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a public outreach campaign for aging adults with visual impairments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenatePassed
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback