TX SB1916 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Dallas County Hospital District or a nonprofit corporation formed by the district regarding certain technology or intellectual property owned by or licensed to the district or corporation.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Dallas County Hospital District or a nonprofit corporation formed by the district regarding certain technology or intellectual property owned by or licensed to the district or corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 1916Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital