TX SB1908 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a general-law municipality to annex territory receiving water and sewer services from a municipal utility district.
Title
Relating to the authority of a general-law municipality to annex territory receiving water and sewer services from a municipal utility district.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2011-04-18 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-04-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
City Government--Annexation
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer