TX SB1891 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limit on the rate of growth of certain appropriations.
Title
Relating to a limit on the rate of growth of certain appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget