TX SB1888 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that a county report the number of certain persons with mental illness detained in that county's jail.
Title
Relating to a requirement that a county report the number of certain persons with mental illness detained in that county's jail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2015-05-18 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse