TX SB1884 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of animal and crop facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of animal and crop facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenatePassed
2019-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Agriculture
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback