TX SB188 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to abolishing the death penalty.
Title
Relating to abolishing the death penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB354 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB215 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB215 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Courts--Juries
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB188 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00188I.htm |