TX SB1877 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1386 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Subjects
ADOPTION
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1877 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01877I.htm |