TX HB1386 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#141 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#141
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1877 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback