TX SB1872 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain contracts for the sale, transportation, or gathering of natural gas.
Title
Relating to certain contracts for the sale, transportation, or gathering of natural gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Business & Commerce--General
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas