TX SB1850 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the presiding officer of the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners.
Title
Relating to the presiding officer of the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1580 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3945 |
2023-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2023-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3945 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3945 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3945 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Animals
Governor
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
Governor
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF