TX SB1849 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an interagency reportable conduct search engine, standards for a person's removal from the employee misconduct registry and eligibility for certification as certain Texas Juvenile Justice Department officers and employees, and the use of certain information by certain state agencies to conduct background checks.
Title
Relating to an interagency reportable conduct search engine, standards for a person's removal from the employee misconduct registry and eligibility for certification as certain Texas Juvenile Justice Department officers and employees, and the use of certain information by certain state agencies to conduct background checks.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1779 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1779 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1779 |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed |
2023-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4236 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Human Services
HB4236 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Human Services
HB4236 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
INTERAGENCY COORDINATION ON REPORTABLE CONDUCT, OFFICE OF
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
INTERAGENCY COORDINATION ON REPORTABLE CONDUCT, OFFICE OF
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions